Global patent index - EP 1001060 A2

EP 1001060 A2 2000-05-17 - System for feeding electric power to motors for use in textile machine

Title (en)

System for feeding electric power to motors for use in textile machine

Title (de)

System zur Versorgung von Elektrischen Energie an Motoren in Textilmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système pour alimenter en énergie électrique des moteurs dans des machines textiles

Publication

EP 1001060 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117968 A

Priority

JP 32083598 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a system for feeding an electric power to motors for use in a textile machine, which serves to feed the electric power to both of a plurality of spindle motors for driving individually a plurality of spindles and a draft motor for driving a draft roller, the system comprising: a converter portion for rectifying an A.C. current that has been obtained from an A.C. power source into a D.C. current; and a chopper portion for adjusting the output voltage of the D.C. current that has been obtained by the conversion in the converter portion, the electric power which has been outputted from the converter portion being fed to the draft motor through a draft inverter, the electric power which has been outputted from the chopper portion being fed to the plurality of spindle motors through a draft driver. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 1/20 (2006.01); D01H 1/244 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001060 A2 20000517; EP 1001060 A3 20000906; CN 1253412 A 20000517; JP 2000144535 A 20000526

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7D 01H 1/32 B, 7H 02P 7/68 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI