Global Patent Index - EP 1001072 A3

EP 1001072 A3 2000-10-25 - Heat pump for a laundry drier

Title (en)

Heat pump for a laundry drier

Title (de)

Wärmepumpe für einen Wäschetrockner

Title (fr)

Pompe à chaleur pour séchoir à linge domestique

Publication

EP 1001072 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122630 A

Priority

DE 19852333 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001072A2] The motor compressor (10,11) is designed for a cryogenic agent with a higher cooling performance than that of the agent in the cooling agent circuit of the heat pump. The process air circuit (2,3,4) is coupled to a cooling agent circuit (8) in which a motor compressor (10,11) conveys a cooling agent (KM) via an evaporator (5) and a liquefier (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/20; F25B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/20 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01); F25B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/206 (2013.01); F25B 9/002 (2013.01); F25B 29/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001072 A2 20000517; EP 1001072 A3 20001025; DE 19852333 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06F 58/20 A, 7F 25B 29/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI