Global Patent Index - EP 1001074 A2

EP 1001074 A2 2000-05-17 - Steel cords for the reinforcement of rubber articles and pneumatic tires

Title (en)

Steel cords for the reinforcement of rubber articles and pneumatic tires

Title (de)

Stahlseile zur Verstärkung von Gummiartikeln sowie Luftreifen

Title (fr)

Câbles d'acier pour le renforcement des articles en caoutchouc et pneumatiques

Publication

EP 1001074 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308899 A

Priority

JP 32330598 A

Abstract (en)

A steel cord for the reinforcement of rubber articles is formed by twisting 4-5 strands, each strand (1) being formed by twisting a sheath (3) of 4-5 steel filaments around a core (2) of a single steel filament, wherein a ratio of diameter dS of the steel filament constituting the sheath to diameter dC of the steel filament constituting the core is within a range of 1.00 - 1.75, and a twisting direction of the sheath in the strand is the same as a twisting direction of the strand in the cord, and a twisting angle a of the sheath in the strand with respect to an axis of the cord, as calculated by a certain defined equation, is within a range of 30 - 52 DEG . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); B60C 9/18 (2006.01); B60C 9/20 (2006.01); D07B 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/0613 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1032 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1044 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1052 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1068 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2006 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2023 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2025 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2039 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2051 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2059 (2013.01); D07B 2501/2046 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. D07B 2201/2051 + D07B 2801/12
  2. D07B 2201/2059 + D07B 2801/12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001074 A2 20000517; EP 1001074 A3 20000906; EP 1001074 B1 20030409; ES 2196729 T3 20031216; JP 2000154483 A 20000606; JP 4097812 B2 20080611

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131110

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140812

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196729 T3

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES FR LU

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR LU

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR LU

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI