Global Patent Index - EP 1001075 A3

EP 1001075 A3 2000-09-06 - Sheathless conveyor cable for cable or municipal railways

Title (en)

Sheathless conveyor cable for cable or municipal railways

Title (de)

Hüllenfreies Förderseil für Seilbahnen oder Stadtbahnen

Title (fr)

Câble transporteur sans gaine pour chemins de fers funiculaires ou municipaux

Publication

EP 1001075 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890314 A

Priority

AT 72098 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001075A2] The cable (1) structure, without a covering, has shaped wire strands (2) at intervals round a plastics core (3). The strands (2) have a trapezoid cross section, with an air space (4) between them The cable uses six to eight strands (2), and pref. six, with a trapezoid cross section. The inner core (3) has a round cross section, with parts of its material forced outwards between the strands (2) through the cable twisting action, forming the air gaps (4) between the strands (2). Spacers can be inserted radially inwards into the air gaps (4) between the strands (2), as tensioners or support strands of a compact plastics or processed plastics fibers. The trapezoid wire strands (2) are compacted, with core inserts of compacted plastics or processed plastics fibers. The strands (2) can contain metal cores. The cable core (3) can have a softer outer plastics material than its center section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 1/06; D07B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/06 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/068 (2013.01); D07B 1/165 (2013.01); D07B 5/10 (2013.01); D07B 7/027 (2013.01); D07B 2201/102 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1032 (2013.01); D07B 2201/104 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1076 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2016 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2023 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2036 (2013.01); D07B 2201/204 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2049 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2055 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2065 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2073 (2013.01); D07B 2205/201 (2013.01); D07B 2205/2039 (2013.01); D07B 2205/2046 (2013.01); D07B 2205/205 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. D07B 2201/2049 + D07B 2801/24
  2. D07B 2201/2055 + D07B 2801/24
  3. D07B 2201/2065 + D07B 2801/24
  4. D07B 2205/201 + D07B 2801/14
  5. D07B 2205/2039 + D07B 2801/14
  6. D07B 2205/2046 + D07B 2801/14
  7. D07B 2205/205 + D07B 2801/14

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001075 A2 20000517; EP 1001075 A3 20000906; EP 1001075 B1 20030813; AT 3186 U1 19991125; DE 59906571 D1 20030918

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-12-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906571

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030909

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030908

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI