Global Patent Index - EP 1001077 A2

EP 1001077 A2 2000-05-17 - Process and apparatus for treating a web material

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for treating a web material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement d' une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 1001077 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118433 A

Priority

DE 19851593 A

Abstract (en)

To handle a moving web, it travels with a continuous belt fourdrinier or blanket through the fourdrinier and/or press section of a papermaking or cardboard manufacturing machine. At least one belt (16) is repeatedly moved across the direction (L) of travel. The belt (16) is moved across the direction (L) of travel periodically, in a linear lateral movement. The position of the belt (16) is monitored by a lateral sensor (10), and the sensor signals are passed to the control (18). The sensor (10) registers the edge of the belt (16), or the sensor has a swing feeler. The belt (16) can be moved continuously across the direction of travel. An Independent claim is included for an assembly with a mechanism to move at least one belt (16) across the direction of movement. Preferred Features: The belt sensor (10) is moved by a drive (12), preferably in a linear movement, with a control (14) for the lateral movement of the belt (16). The sensor drive control (14) has at least one pressure control (32), operated by a motor. The drive (12) has at least one piston/cylinder unit, with a spring return. The stroke length is adjustable, for the lateral movement of the belt (16), and its lateral movement speed can be varied.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren sowie einer entsprechenden Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Materialbahn wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn wird die Materialbahn zumindest streckenweise zusammen mit wenigstens einem umlaufenden endlosen Band 16 wie insbesondere einem Sieb- oder Filzband in dessen Umlaufrichtung L bewegt. Dabei wird das Band wiederholt auch allgemein quer zur Umlaufrichtung L bewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/36; D21F 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/032 (2006.01); D21F 1/30 (2006.01); D21F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 23/032 (2013.01); D21F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851593 A1 20000511; EP 1001077 A2 20000517; EP 1001077 A3 20040211; US 2002088838 A1 20020711; US 6402005 B1 20020611; US 6641017 B2 20031104

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060618

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI