Global Patent Index - EP 1001080 A2

EP 1001080 A2 2000-05-17 - Forming section

Title (en)

Forming section

Title (de)

Blattbildungssystem

Title (fr)

Section de formage

Publication

EP 1001080 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112925 A

Priority

DE 19852634 A

Abstract (en)

The stock inlet jet (1), for a production machine for paper or cardboard, has a support structure with at least one support (6) for at least part of the jet wall against at least one of the fourdrinier deflection surfaces (5.1,5.2). At least one of the deflection surfaces (5.1,5.2) for the fourdriniers is formed by a roller and at least one is a sliding shoe. At least one fourdrinier deflector (4.1,4.2) is a web shaping roller or a breast roller. At least one of the supports (6) is a roller or a shoe. The support structure (6-8) is fitted to the jet wall (2.2) by at least one pressure chamber (7), and is in sections at least in the lateral direction, with adjustments to control the intensity of the support action by sections. The support assembly (6-8) can be a number of sections fitted together, with separate adjustment. At least one of the fourdrinier deflection units (4.1,4.2) has a bending adjustment. At least one support table is at the zone of at least one stock inlet jet wall (2.1,2.2) with a pressure unit between the table and the wall, as a pressure chamber. The pressure chamber is in segments, laterally between the support table and the jet wall (2.2), to work with different pressures, upstream of the support.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Blattbildungssystem einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit einem Stoffauflauf mit einer Stoffauflaufdüse (1), die aus zwei seitlich angeordneten Düsenseitenschilden und einer ersten und einer zweiten maschinenbreit verlaufenden Düsenwand (2.1, 2.2) gebildet wird, weiterhin mit zwei im Bereich der Stoffauflaufdüse (1) konvergierenden Sieben (3.1, 3.2), und mit mindestens zwei Umlenkvorrichtungen (4.1, 4.2), welche die Siebe im Bereich der Stoffauflaufdüse über eine Umlenkoberfläche (5.1, 5.2) führen. Die Erfindung ist einerseits dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß mindestens eine Abstützvorrichtung mit mindestens einem Stützelement (6) für mindestens einen Teil einer Düsenwand gegen mindestens eine Umlenkoberfläche (5.1, 5.2) vorgesehen ist, andererseits daß im Bereich mindestens einer Düsenwand (2.1; 2.2) mindestens ein Stütztisch (9) mit mindestens einer druckerzeugenden Vorrichtung zwischen Stütztisch (9) und Düsenwand (2.2) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21G 9/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001080 A2 20000517; EP 1001080 A3 20040211; DE 19852634 A1 20000518; US 6319363 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060204

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI