Global patent index - EP 1001083 A1

EP 1001083 A1 2000-05-17 - Water retaining and optical brighteners activating polymeric composition, paper coating colours and coated paper

Title (en)

Water retaining and optical brighteners activating polymeric composition, paper coating colours and coated paper

Title (de)

Wasserrückhaltige, optische Aufheller aktivierende Polymerzusammensetzung, Streichfarben, und gestrichenes Papier

Title (fr)

Composition polymérique rétentrice d'eau et activatrice d'azurants optiques, sauces de couchage pour papier, et papier couché

Publication

EP 1001083 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420217 A

Priority

FR 9814299 A

Abstract (en)

Aqueous polymeric composition, stable in liquid form, which enables regulation of water retention, activation of whiteners and viscosity of paper sizes, comprises at least a polyvinylic alcohol (PVA) and at least a neutral or alkaline hydrosoluble polymer. Aqueous polymeric composition, stable in liquid form, which enables regulation of water retention, activation of whiteners and viscosity of paper sizes, comprises at least a polyvinylic alcohol (PVA) and at least a neutral or alkaline hydrosoluble polymer; said PVA having Ostwald viscosity less than 5 mPa.s corresponding to degree of polymerisation less than 600; and degree of hydrolysis = 70-100 mol.% measured from ester index corresponding to mol.% vinyl acetate groups = 30 - 0. Independent claims are also included for an aqueous suspension or slurry of mineral fillers containing the composition for use in paper sizes; and a sheet of paper coated with the suspension or slurry.

Abstract (fr)

Compositions aqueuses polymériques liquides assurant la fonction d'activation des azurants optiques, la fonction de rétention d'eau ainsi que la fonction de régulation de la viscosité des sauces de couchage papetière contenant une sélection d'au moins un alcool polyvinylique et un épaississant hydrosoluble. Suspensions aqueuses de charges minérales contenant les dites compositions polymériques ainsi que les sauces de couchages et les feuilles de papier couché obtenues.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 29/04 (2006.01); C08L 101/14 (2006.01); C09D 129/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/60 (2006.01); D21H 21/28 (2006.01); D21H 21/30 (2006.01); D21H 19/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/60 (2013.01); D21H 19/58 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31591 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31895 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001083 A1 20000517; CA 2287805 A1 20000510; FR 2785629 A1 20000512; FR 2785629 B1 20001222; ID 23758 A 20000511; JP 2000144037 A 20000526; KR 20000035317 A 20000626; NO 995479 A 20000511; NO 995479 D0 19991109; PL 336490 A1 20000522; TR 9902780 A2 20000621; TR 9902780 A3 20000621; TW 500857 B 20020901; US 2002004550 A1 20020110; US 2002156179 A1 20021024; US 2003144408 A1 20030731; US 6297317 B1 20011002; US 6521701 B2 20030218

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031120

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COATEX S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI