Global Patent Index - EP 1001084 A2

EP 1001084 A2 2000-05-17 - Deacidifying agent

Title (en)

Deacidifying agent

Title (de)

Entsäuerungsmittel

Title (fr)

Agent de déacidification

Publication

EP 1001084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122694 A

Priority

  • DE 19852777 A
  • DE 19921616 A

Abstract (en)

Deacidifying agent for organic material contains a dispersion of nanoparticles of alkaline metal compound in an organic solvent.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Entsäuerungmittel für organisches Material, das eine Dispersion aus Nanopartikeln aus alkalischen Metallverbindungen, bevorzugt Erdalkaliverbindungen, in einem Lösungsmittel enthält sowie ein Verfahren zur Entsäuerung von organischem Material durch Tränken oder Sprühung. Das Entsäuerungsmaterial sowie das Verfahren eignen sich besonders für Schriftgut, Textilien, Grafiken, Leinwände und Holzgegenstände.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001084 A2 20000517; EP 1001084 A3 20020116

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101124

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI