Global Patent Index - EP 1001086 A1

EP 1001086 A1 2000-05-17 - Paving element and street provided with a series of such paving elements

Title (en)

Paving element and street provided with a series of such paving elements

Title (de)

Strassenpflaster und mit Serien von solchen Pflastern versehene Strassen

Title (fr)

Elément de pavage et rues equipées avec des séries de tels éléments

Publication

EP 1001086 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203829 A

Priority

NL 1010563 A

Abstract (en)

A paving element manufactured from water-permeable material, wherein a pipe section (2) provided with a number of inlet openings (3) is included in the paving element, the pipe section (2) being connectable to a first water discharge system (6), and the inlet openings (3) being provided in the paving element. A street provided with a series of such paving elements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/225 (2013.01); E01C 11/228 (2013.01); E01C 2201/202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001086 A1 20000517; NL 1010563 C2 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI