Global Patent Index - EP 1001089 A1

EP 1001089 A1 2000-05-17 - Novel technique for stay cable system

Title (en)

Novel technique for stay cable system

Title (de)

Schrägseilsystem

Title (fr)

Système de haubanage

Publication

EP 1001089 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98119471 A

Priority

EP 98119471 A

Abstract (en)

A stay cable system, which is exclusively for the tendons with parallel strands (I) covered by a sheath pipe (Ib), comprises main anchorage sockets (1), auxiliary anchorage sockets (2), anchoring tie beam (3), anchoring bed (4) that is used for girders other than steel I-girder or for pylon anchoring structure other than tie beam, dehumidification protection system (5a) - (5g). Main features of the system are: 1) Anchoring holes in anchorage sockets (1, 2) are divided into two symmetrical groups (1a, 1b, 2a, 2b), so that main anchorage socket (1) can reliably be arranged at bottom part of any kind of girders holding cable axis coincided with girder web and double half-cylindrical auxiliary anchorage sockets (2) can be arranged on both sides of the web in steel I-girder (II), in anchoring tie beam (3) or in steel anchoring bed (4). 2) Based on the help of auxiliary anchorage sockets, in which parallel strands are anchored or bonded individually, ordinary jaws can reliably be used in main anchorage socket while individual strand replacement is allowable. 3) Dehumidification protection system keeps all parts of strands (I, Ia - not to be cut off after final jacking) under observable, controllable and reliable protected condition, which also facilitates individual strand replacement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/14; E01D 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/14 (2006.01); E01D 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/14 (2013.01); E01D 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • H. SVENSSON AND K. HUMPF: "Die Schrägkabelbrücke über den Mississippi bei Burlington (USA)", 1994, STAHLBAU 63 - HEFT 7, pages: 196-197 - F 8,9,10
  • BROCHURE FREYSSINET: "Stay Cables may 1994", 1994, pages: 10,11,14 - FIG19,22
  • "Brochure VSL Stay Cable System 200 SSI", article "Corrosion Protection, Outer Stay Pipe"
  • P.R. TAYLOR: "Annacis Bridge Superstructure - A Major Composite Cable-stayed Bridge", 6 December 1985, CBA BUCKLAND AND TAYLOR CONSULTING ENGINEERS VANCOUVER B.C., pages: FIG. 2
  • H.S. SVENSSON AND T.G. LOVETT: "Cable-stayed Houston Ship Channel Crossing", pages: 5, FIG.7
  • "East Bridge", 1998, THE STOREBAELT PUBLICATIONS, pages: 374 - 375

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3723795 A1 19881229 - BORELLY WOLFGANG DIPL ING [DE]
  • [A] MONTENS S: "LE FRANCHISSEMENT DE L'ISERE PAR L'AUTOROUTE A 49", TRAVAUX, no. 666, 1 June 1991 (1991-06-01), pages 16 - 40, XP000216585
  • [DA] SVENSSON: "Die Schrägkabelbrücke über den Mississippi bei Burlington,USA", STAHLBAU., vol. 63, no. 7, 1994, BERLIN DE, pages 193 - 197, XP002093577

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001089 A1 20000517; EP 1001089 B1 20030709; AT 244794 T 20030715; CN 1266928 A 20000920; CN 1266929 A 20000920; CN 2412028 Y 20001227; CN 2412029 Y 20001227; DE 69816303 D1 20030814

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051015

2005-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-07-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-12-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-10-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021002

2001-04-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI