Global Patent Index - EP 1001096 A3

EP 1001096 A3 2000-09-06 - Built-in sink

Title (en)

Built-in sink

Title (de)

Einbauspüle

Title (fr)

Evier encastré

Publication

EP 1001096 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122198 A

Priority

DE 29820088 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001096A2] The material used for the built-in sink has a comparatively thin wall or material thickness so that the width of the sink edge area is a multiple of its material thickness. A material strip (30) adjoins the upper edge of the sink edge underneath to form the centring surface. This material strip can be formed by a separate part not integral with the sink and indeed of different material therefrom or can be formed in one piece round the sink.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820088 U1 19990114; EP 1001096 A2 20000517; EP 1001096 A3 20000906; IL 132766 A 20031123; IL 132766 D0 20010319

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100427

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLANCO GMBH + CO KG

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK LI NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI