Global Patent Index - EP 1001100 A2

EP 1001100 A2 2000-05-17 - Installation arrangement

Title (en)

Installation arrangement

Title (de)

Installationseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'installation

Publication

EP 1001100 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121371 A

Priority

DE 19851449 A

Abstract (en)

The installation kit for a lavatory, with a concealed cistern in the wall, has a horizontal mounting rail at the building structure. A strap (2) is fitted to the neighboring pillars (10) of the lightweight wall structure (1) at their facing sides. Each strap (2) has a holder arm (20), at right angles to the strap surface, parallel to the wall (1), to support the mounting rail (3).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Installation eines WC-Körpers mit einer Unterputzspüleinrichtung, wobei eine am Gebäude etwa waagerecht anordbare Montageschiene (3) vorgesehen ist, ist zur Verbesserung vorgeschlagen, daß für die Installation in einer aus Ständerwerk gebildeten Leichtbauwand (1) an zwei benachbarten Ständern (10) an den einander zugekehrten Seitenflächen (100) jeweils eine befestigbare Lasche (2) vorgesehen ist, wobei jede Lasche (2) einen senkrecht von der Seitenfläche (100) parallel zur Leichtbauwand vorstehenden Haltearm (20) hat, an denen die Montageschiene (3) befestigbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/143 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851449 A1 20000511; EP 1001100 A2 20000517; EP 1001100 A3 20030326

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060712

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHEDAL SANITAERSYSTEME GMBH & CO.KG

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHEDAL GMBH & CO.KG

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI