Global patent index - EP 1001102 A2

EP 1001102 A2 2000-05-17 - Insulating panel system with insulating panel and tongue and groove connection

Title (en)

Insulating panel system with insulating panel and tongue and groove connection

Title (de)

Dämmplattensystem mit Dämmplatte und Nut-Feder-Verbindung

Title (fr)

Système de panneaux d'isolation avec panneaux d'isolation et connexion par rainure et languette

Publication

EP 1001102 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121826 A

Priority

DE 29820303 U

Abstract (en)

The panels (1) are joined together by tongue-and-groove joints. These are formed by having grooves (11) in the abutting side walls (14) of the panels, which receive springs (2) extending between two grooves in adjacent panels. The springs are formed as strips with barbs oriented in the length direction on both sides. Preferably the resilient strip comprises an endless extruded elastic plastics material and the panels comprise foamed styrene polymer material. The groove is cut or moulded into the panel, extending all the way around it.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Dämmplattensystem, insbesondere als Boden-, Wand- oder Deckenunterkonstruktion, mit Dämmplatte (1) und Nut-Feder-Verbindung zur ineinandergreifenden Flächenbelegung, wobei die Nut-Feder-Verbindung aus an Stirnflächen (14) der Platten (1) angeordneten Nuten (11) und zur Verbindung zweier aneinandergrenzender Platten in die Nuten einlegbaren Federn (2) besteht, wobei die Feder (2) als Streifen (21) ausgebildet ist und beiderseits in Längsrichtung angeordnete Spreizelemente (22) aufweist. Damit wird insbesondere eine sichere Befestigung der Dämmplatten untereinander bei einfacher Wiederverwertbarkeit der Elemente ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/61; E04B 1/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6154 (2013.01); E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/185 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0511 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820303 U1 19990114; EP 1001102 A2 20000517; EP 1001102 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI