Global patent index - EP 1001103 A2

EP 1001103 A2 2000-05-17 - Edge trimming profile for wall cladding

Title (en)

Edge trimming profile for wall cladding

Title (de)

Randleiste für Wanddeckungen

Title (fr)

Profilé de bordure pour revêtement de mur

Publication

EP 1001103 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99106467 A

Priority

  • DE 29820198 U
  • DE 29822615 U

Abstract (en)

The system consists of an angled base profile (1) which is open at the front, and an intermediate piece which is also open at the front and which can be slid into the base profile. A plaster edge profile (17) is also provided which can be slid into either the base profile or the intermediate profile in order to form a flush socket edge or joint for the insulation panels. The lower head piece of the plaster edge profile is designed so as to rectangular, having undercuts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Randleiste für Wanddeckungen, insbesondere überputzte Dämmplattenverkleidungen, mit einem an der Wand zu befestigenden Grundprofil (1) und einem an dem Grundprofil (1) direkt oder über ein Zwischenprofil anbringbaren Abschlußprofil (2). Erfindungsgemäß ist das Abschlußprofil (2) an dem Grundprofil (1) in variablem Abstand zur Wand anbringbar. Durch die Erfindungslösung können Wanddeckungen mit Randleisten unabhängig vom Verlauf des Mauerwerks unter der Randleiste fluchtgerecht hergestellt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76; E04F 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04F 13/06 (2006.01); E04F 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/765 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04F 13/06 (2013.01); E04F 13/068 (2013.01); E04F 19/02 (2013.01); E04F 2013/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001103 A2 20000517; EP 1001103 A3 20010606

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI