Global Patent Index - EP 1001105 A2

EP 1001105 A2 2000-05-17 - Heat reflecting layer, method of making a heat reflecting layer and its use

Title (en)

Heat reflecting layer, method of making a heat reflecting layer and its use

Title (de)

Wärmereflektierende Schicht, Verfahren zur Herstellung einer wärmereflektierenden Beschichtung und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Couche thermoréfléchisante, procédé de fabrication d'une couche thermoréfléchisante et utilisation

Publication

EP 1001105 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122304 A

Priority

DE 19851504 A

Abstract (en)

A graphite-based heat reflective surface layer for bodies or body cavities is new. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above heat reflective coating layer by application of pure graphite or a graphite-containing coating material onto a surface.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine wärmereflektierende Schicht vorgeschlagen, in der Graphit einen wesentlichen Bestandteil darstellt. Des Weiteren wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer wärmereflektierenden Beschichtung, die als wesentlichen Bestandteil Graphit enthält vorgeschlagen, wobei ein graphithaltiges oder aus reinem Graphit bestehendes Beschichtungsmaterial auf eine Oberfläche aufgetragen wird. Erfindungsgemäß kommt diese Schicht bevorzugt bei Hohlraumoberflächen und/oder Außenflächen von wärmedämmenden Bausteinen, wie z.B. Hochlochziegel zur Anwendung. Zur Aufbringung der erfindungsgemäßen Schicht auf Hohlraumoberflächen und/oder Außenflächen von wärmedämmenden Bausteinen, wie z.B. Hochlochziegel kann insbesondere das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren eingesetzt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0286 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001105 A2 20000517; EP 1001105 A3 20010418; DE 19851504 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI