Global Patent Index - EP 1001113 A1

EP 1001113 A1 2000-05-17 - Fence post with integral support system

Title (en)

Fence post with integral support system

Title (de)

Weidenzaunpfahl mit integriertem Abstützsystem

Title (fr)

Poteau de clôture avec système de support incorporé

Publication

EP 1001113 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121698 A

Priority

EP 98121698 A

Abstract (en)

The stake has a shaft (2) with a connector (6) with clamp holder (7) for fixing stays. The heads of the stays are formed to correspond with the clamp holder so that they can be detachably pushed on and clamped. The stake and stays are identical. The connector can be connected to the shaft by a reversible elastic web (8). The connector can have clamping holders in the form of parallel or conically aligned guide rails. The heads of the stake or connector can be strip like elements protruding on each side perpendicular from shaft.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Erfindung handelt es sich um einen sogenannten Weidezaunpfahl für landwirtschaftliche Zaunanlagen. Bei Verwendung derartiger Pfähle für Weidezaunanlagen erübrigt sich die Verwendung spezieller "Abstützpfähle". Es können jeweils baugleiche Pfähle auf beliebige Weise kombiniert werden, wobei ein "Abstutzen" der Pfähle stets gewahrleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/08; E04H 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/08 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/08 (2013.01); E04H 17/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001113 A1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041005

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030627

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI