Global Patent Index - EP 1001116 A2

EP 1001116 A2 2000-05-17 - Method of actuating a vehicle door lock system

Title (en)

Method of actuating a vehicle door lock system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Betätigung eines Kraftfahrzeug-Türschliesssystems

Title (fr)

Méthode d'actionnement d'un système de verrouillage d'une porte d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1001116 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121532 A

Priority

  • DE 19900309 A
  • DE 19852273 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves starting an electric motor (6) in an opening interval causing the door to open via a gearbox stage (7). Force is only transferred by the gearbox if the motor speed exceeds a minimum level. When the door closure system is activated, the motor is also started to start the run-up phase and regulated to a revolution rate below the minimum value. After the end of the authorization check interval, the motor speed is raised to above the minimum value for door opening if there is a positive result.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zur Betätigung eines Kraftfahrzeug-Türschließsystems mit elektrischer Öffnungshilfe (5), das mit einer fernsteuerbaren Steuerelektronik (8) mit einem Fernsteuermodul (9) bei der Bedienungsperson ausgerüstet ist, wobei die Steuerelektronik (8) zeitlich ein Anlaufintervall, ein Berechtigungs-Prüfintervall, ggf. ein Aktionsintervall und ein Tür-Öffnungsintervall benötigt und wobei im Tür-Öffnungsintervall ein Elektromotor (6) der Öffnungshilfe (5) gestartet wird und über eine zwischengeschaltete Getriebestufe (7) die Türöffnung bewirkt, das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß über die Getriebestufe (7) nur bei einer eine bestimmte Mindestdrehzahl überschreitenden Drehzahl des Elektromotors (6) eine die Türöffnung bewirkende Kraftübertragung erfolgt, daß beim Betätigen des Türschließsystems zum Starten des Anlaufintervalls auch der Elektromotor (6) gestartet und zunächst auf eine unter der Mindestdrehzahl liegende Drehzahl geregelt wird und daß nach Ende des Berechtigungs-Prüfintervalls bei positivem Ergebnis eine Drehzahlerhöhung des Elektromotors (6) über die Mindestdrehzahl zum Zwecke der Türöffnung erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12; E05B 65/20; E05B 65/32; H02K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001116 A2 20000517; EP 1001116 A3 20031119; EP 1001116 B1 20050608; ES 2242342 T3 20051101

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101030

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242342 T3

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912143 P 20050714

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/32 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02K 7/00 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 B

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI