Global Patent Index - EP 1001119 A1

EP 1001119 A1 2000-05-17 - Vehicle door lock with internal and/or external electrical locking/unlocking device

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock with internal and/or external electrical locking/unlocking device

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürschloss mit innerer und/oder äusserer elektrischer Verriegelungs-/Entriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte à condamnation/décondamnation électrique extérieure et/ou intérieure pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1001119 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402693 A

Priority

  • FR 9814061 A
  • FR 9908226 A

Abstract (en)

The lock comprises a bolt assembly (1) that co-operates with a striking plate (3). A pawl arrangement is controlled by an electronic release mechanism (18). This can be activated using the bolt within the door assembly or through remote means.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure de porte de véhicule automobile comprenant : un pêne (1) coopérant avec une gâche (3) ; un cliquet (5) bloquant le pêne en position fermée; un mécanisme de libération du pêne comportant un organe de commande (7) mobile en réponse à l'actionnement d'une poignée de la porte; un dispositif électromécanique de condamnation/décondamnation (15) faisant passer la serrure dans un état décondamné en réponse à un signal de décondamnation produit par un dispositif électronique de reconnaissance (26); il est prévu un dispositif à accumulation d'énergie (8,11,13), incluant un ressort (13), de telle façon que, dans l'état condamné de la serrure, le ressort accumule de l'énergie en étant bandé par l'organe de commande en réponse à l'actionnement de la poignée, et que, lorsque la serrure passe à l'état décondamné, l'énergie emmagasinée dans le ressort est libérée et le dispositif à accumulation d'énergie fait passer le cliquet dans sa position "échappée", libérant le pêne. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/25 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5978 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7096 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7102 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001119 A1 20000517; EP 1001119 B1 20040107; BR 9904462 A 20000919; DE 69914045 D1 20040212; DE 69914045 T2 20041125; ES 2213994 T3 20040901; FR 2785638 A1 20000512; FR 2785638 B1 20001229; US 6367296 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151030

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151030

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151029

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151029

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151029

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914045

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69914045

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69914045

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69914045

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213994 T3

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914045 P 20040212

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI