Global Patent Index - EP 1001120 A1

EP 1001120 A1 2000-05-17 - Closure

Title (en)

Closure

Title (de)

Verschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture

Publication

EP 1001120 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121322 A

Priority

EP 98121322 A

Abstract (en)

The closure has a locking mechanism with a bolt in a bearing housing (50) and also a compensating element (45) for adapting the closure to different material thicknesses used for the drawer or door. The bearing housing is attached to the outside of the drawer or door etc and holds an operating element (40) for the bolt. The operating element can have the compensating element such as in the form of a slide guide containing a movable fixing attachment (35) for the bolt.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Verschluß zum Verriegeln eines Korpuselementes (10), beispielsweise einer Klappe, Tür, Schublade oder dgl. an einem Korpus, mit einer Verriegelungsmechanik, bei der in einem Lagergehäuse (50) ein Riegel (30) zumindest teilweise aufgenommen ist, wobei der Riegel (30) in der Schließstellung des Korpuselementes (10) mit einem Rastelement (15) verriegelt. Ein solcher Verschluß läßt sich dann an unterschiedliche Korpuselemente (10) mit verschiedenen Materialstärken ohne zusätzlichen Umbauaufwand anbringen, wenn vorgesehen ist, daß die Verriegelungsmechanik im Lagergehäuse (50) ein Ausgleichselement (45) aufweist, mittels derer eine Anpassung des Verschlusses auf verschiedene Materialstärken des Korpuselementes (10) möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/46; E05C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/46 (2006.01); E05C 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/46 (2013.01); E05B 63/006 (2013.01); E05C 3/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0154605 A1 19850911 - MEIER GERD

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001120 A1 20000517; EP 1001120 B1 20050427; EP 1001120 B8 20050928; DE 59812756 D1 20050602

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081109

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KARL SIMON G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-10 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KING, GERLINDE

2005-07-27 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KING, GERLINDE

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812756 P 20050602

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030917

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI