Global Patent Index - EP 1001122 A1

EP 1001122 A1 2000-05-17 - Plug actuated multiple bolt espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Plug actuated multiple bolt espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Mehrriegeltreibstangenschloss mit Wechselbetätigung

Title (fr)

Crémone à plusieurs pênes manoeuvrable d'un barillet

Publication

EP 1001122 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890356 A

Priority

AT 188498 A

Abstract (en)

The multi-bolt lock with exchange operation has a thrust bar connection to at least one of the bolts. Between the bolt-side thrust bar piece and the drive-side thrust bar piece is a driver connection with a free position. A driver is fixed to a thrust bar and engages in a long hole of the other thrust bar piece. The free position is provided in the direction of withdrawal of the at least one bolt (5). A spring (11) engages on the driver connection and supports with each end on one of the thrust bar pieces (3,4) and this in the sense of a shortening of its effective total length. A stop (13) is provided for limiting the displacement path of the bolt-side thrust bar piece when the bolt (5) is fully drawn backwards.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mehrriegelschloss mit Wechselbetätigung umfasst mindestens eine Schubstangenverbindung zu einem Riegel (5). Zwischen einem riegelseitigen und einem antriebsseitigen oder schlossseitigen Schubstangenstück (3, 4) ist eine Mitnehmerverbindung mit einer Freistellung, insbesondere ein schubstangenfester Mitnehmer (9), der in ein Langloch (10) des anderen Schubstangenstückes (3) eingreift, vorgesehen. Im Bereich der Mitnehmerverbindung ist ferner eine Feder (11) angeordnet, die die Schubstangenstücke (3, 4) im Sinne einer Verkürzung ihrer Gesamtlänge vorspannt. Vorzugsweise übergreifen die beiden Schubstangenstücke (3, 4) einander und im Überlappungsbereicht ist die Feder (11) eingespannt, die zwischen Auflagen, beispielsweise L-förmig abgewinkelten Enden der Schubstangenstücke (3, 4), liegt. Schließlich ist ein Anschlag (13) für das riegelseitige Schubstangenstück (4) vorgesehen, an dem letzteres anliegt, wenn der Riegel (5) zur Gänze eingezogen ist. Der durch die Freistellung gegebene Weg (B) steht für die Wechselbetätigung zur Verfügung, sobald das riegelseitige Schubstangenstück (4) am Anschlag (13) anliegt (Fig. 3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001122 A1 20000517; EP 1001122 B1 20040331; AT 406597 B 20000626; AT A188498 A 19991115; DE 59909021 D1 20040506

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909021

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROTO FRANK EISENWARENFABRIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROTO FRANK EISENWARENFABRIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909021 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB IT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI