Global Patent Index - EP 1001123 A2

EP 1001123 A2 2000-05-17 - Door or window hinge

Title (en)

Door or window hinge

Title (de)

Tür- oder Fensterband

Title (fr)

Penture de porte ou de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1001123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121657 A

Priority

DE 29820314 U

Abstract (en)

Tabs on the hinge plate (10) and rail clips are projections which can penetrate into the top surface of the window or door leaf frames (11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Tür- oder Fensterband (10), mit einem an einem feststehenden Rahmen (11) angeschlagenen Rahmenbandteil (13), das mittels einer Schwenkachse (14) gelenkig mit einem Flügelbandteil (15) verbunden ist, das einen an einem Flügelrahmen (16) horizontal verschieblichen Bandlappen (17) hat, der mit Hilfe einer verschiebefesten Klemmplatte (18) vertikal formschlüssig abgestützt und am Flügelrahmen (16) festklemmbar ist. Um ein Band mit den Eingangs genannten Merkmalen so zu verbessern, daß ein Absenken des Flügelbandes am Flügelrahmen ausgeschlossen wird, wird es vorteilhafterweise so ausgebildet, daß der Bandlappen (17) und/oder die Klemmplatte (18) in die Oberfläche (16) des Flügelrahmens (16) eindringbare Vorsprünge aufweist bzw. aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0054 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 11/0054 (2013.01); E05D 2007/0484 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820314 U1 20000330; AT 280303 T 20041115; EP 1001123 A2 20000517; EP 1001123 A3 20030402; EP 1001123 B1 20041020

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS-DIETER NIEMANN, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59910890

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIEMANN, HANS-DIETER, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59910890

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910890

- Representative's name: AXEL DRAUDT, DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910890

- Representative's name: DRAUDT, AXEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910890 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI