Global patent index - EP 1001127 A1

EP 1001127 A1 2000-05-17 - Door sill

Title (en)

Door sill

Title (de)

Türschwelle

Title (fr)

Seuil de porte

Publication

EP 1001127 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122345 A

Priority

DE 29820383 U

Abstract (en)

The threshold (10) is provided with a hollow metal profile (11) having an insulating profile (13) consisting of plastics and having a hollow chamber (12). The metal profile has a door stop wall (14) which is connected to the metal profile via catches, and the metal profile is covered on the door inside by the insulating profile. The threshold is attached to the floor by connectors (16) and the catches of the insulation profile (13) are located in the region of the connectors.

Abstract (de)

Türschwelle, mit einem Metallhohlprofil (11), mit einem aus Kunststoff bestehenden, eine Hohlkammer (12) aufweisenden Dämmprofil (13), das eine vertikale Türanschlagwand (14) hat und mit dem Metallhohlprofil (11) verbunden ist, das von der Hohlkammer (12) des Dämmprofils (13) oder zumindest von dessen Türanschlagwand (14) türinnenseitig vollständig abgedeckt ist. Um einen stabilen Zusammenbau des Profils (11) mit dem Profil (13) zu erreichen, wird die Türschwelle so ausgebildet, daß die Schwelle (10) am Boden (15) mit Befestigungsmitteln (16) festgelegt ist, und daß die Verbindung des Dämmprofils (13) mit dem Metallhohlprofil (11) im Bereich der Befestigungsmittel (16) oder türaußenseitig davon angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E06B 2001/707 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820383 U1 20000330; AT 272161 T 20040815; EP 1001127 A1 20000517; EP 1001127 B1 20040728

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DRAUDT, AXEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: AXEL DRAUDT, DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DRAUDT, AXEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI