Global patent index - EP 1001129 A1

EP 1001129 A1 2000-05-17 - Device for providing weather protection

Title (en)

Device for providing weather protection

Title (de)

Wetterschutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre les intempéries

Publication

EP 1001129 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203761 A

Priority

EP 98203761 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a shielding device, comprising means for unrolling and rolling a protective sheet (1) from, respectively on, two winding bodies (2,3), and means for maintaining the unrolled sheet (1) substantially flat between said two winding bodies (2,3), wherein the means for unrolling and rolling the protective sheet (1) comprise a separate hydraulic motor (M) acting on each winding body (2,3), and a regulation system causing the hydraulic motor (M) of a winding body (2,3) to perform a driving action when said winding body (2,3) is rolling up the protective sheet (1) and causing the motor (M) of a winding body (2,3) to perform a braking action when said winding body (2,3) is unrolling the protective sheet (1). The regulation system may comprise hydraulic pumping means, hydraulic circuitry and hydraulic regulation valves. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/68; E06B 3/66; E06B 9/08; E06B 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/66 (2006.01); E06B 9/08 (2006.01); E06B 9/18 (2006.01); E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/18 (2013.01); E06B 3/66 (2013.01); E06B 9/08 (2013.01); E06B 9/68 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001129 A1 20000517

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK FR GB LU NL

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB LU NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI