Global Patent Index - EP 1001132 A3

EP 1001132 A3 2000-12-20 - Telescoping/release joint

Title (en)

Telescoping/release joint

Title (de)

Teleskopier- und lösbarer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Raccord télescopique et dissociable

Publication

EP 1001132 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99308661 A

Priority

US 18538398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001132A2] A downhole tool comprises a mandrel (120) having a radially reduced region (134) and a housing (108) slidably disposed exteriorly around the mandrel (120). A support ring (138) is initially disposed between the housing (108) and the mandrel (120). The support ring (138) supports an axial load between the housing (108) and the mandrel (120) until the relative axial movement between the housing (108) and the mandrel (120) shifts the support ring (138) into the radially reduced region (134). Thereafter, the downhole tool is telescopically extendable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/07; E21B 17/06; E21B 33/124; E21B 43/116; E21B 43/119; E21B 43/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/06 (2006.01); E21B 17/07 (2006.01); E21B 33/124 (2006.01); E21B 43/116 (2006.01); E21B 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/116 (2013.01); E21B 17/06 (2013.01); E21B 17/07 (2013.01); E21B 33/124 (2013.01); E21B 43/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001132 A2 20000517; EP 1001132 A3 20001220; NO 995348 A 20000504; NO 995348 D0 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 17/07 A, 7E 21B 17/06 B, 7E 21B 33/124 B, 7E 21B 43/116 B, 7E 21B 43/119 B, 7E 21B 43/26 B

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGGINS, JEFFRY W.

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI