Global Patent Index - EP 1001134 A1

EP 1001134 A1 2000-05-17 - Anchoring device with a seismic sensor

Title (en)

Anchoring device with a seismic sensor

Title (de)

Verankerungseinrichtung mit seismischem Sensor

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ancrage avec un capteur sismique

Publication

EP 1001134 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120626 A

Priority

DE 19852455 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an anchoring rod (21) and an anchoring head with at least one vibration sensor mounted on the anchoring rod. Several vibration sensors (25-27) can be mounted at different relative positions in relation to the longitudinal axis of the anchoring rod. The sensors can be mounted in a fitting on the end of the rod remote from the anchoring head with a cable guide (22) from the sensors to the head. Independent claims are also included for a system anchoring arrangement for tunnel construction and for a method of high resolution seismic tomography.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verankerungseinrichtung mit einem Ankerstab (21) und einem Ankerkopf oder ein Aufnehmerstab zur Seismik und Tomographie von Gebirgszonen, besitzt mindestens einen am Ankerstab (21) angebrachten Schwingungssensor (25-27). Es wird ein Verfahren zur hochauflösenden Seismik oder Tomographie von Gebirgszonen oder Bauwerken beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 21/00; E21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/10 (2006.01); E21D 9/00 (2006.01); E21D 21/00 (2006.01); E21F 17/18 (2006.01); G01V 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21F 17/185 (2013.01); E21D 9/004 (2013.01); E21D 21/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9819044 A1 19980507 - GEOFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM POTSDAM [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001134 A1 20000517; EP 1001134 B1 20040915; AT 276429 T 20041015; DE 19852455 A1 20000531; DE 19852455 C2 20031224; JP 2000147130 A 20000526; JP 4344440 B2 20091014

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HELMHOLTZ-ZENTRUM POTSDAM DEUTSCHES GEOFORSCHU, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELMHOLTZ-ZENTRUM POTSDAM DEUTSCHES GEOFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM - GFZ, DE

2009-06-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HELMHOLTZ-ZENTRUM POTSDAM DEUTSCHES GEOFORSCHUNGS

- Free text: GEOFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM POTSDAM#TELEGRAFENBERG A17#14473 POSTDAM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HELMHOLTZ-ZENTRUM POTSDAM DEUTSCHES GEOFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM - GFZ#TELEGRAFENBERG#14473 POTSDAM (DE)

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH FR IT LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI