Global Patent Index - EP 1001143 A3

EP 1001143 A3 2000-12-06 - Valve control for intake and exhaust valves in internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Valve control for intake and exhaust valves in internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Ventilsteuerung für Ein- und Auslassventile von Verbrennungsmotoren

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape pour soupapes d'admission et d'échappement de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1001143 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121736 A

Priority

DE 19852209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001143A2] The valve controller has at least one control element with which the inlet/outlet valve is opened and closed. At least one piezo element (1) actuates at least one valve element (3) that controls the input and output flow of a pressurized medium to at least one control piston (15) that is displaced by the pressurized medium against a countering force to open the valve (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; F01L 1/14; F01L 1/24; F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/20 (2006.01); F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/25 (2006.01); F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F16K 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/143 (2013.01); F01L 1/25 (2013.01); F01L 9/02 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001143 A2 20000517; EP 1001143 A3 20001206; EP 1001143 B1 20050921; DE 19852209 A1 20000518; DE 59912577 D1 20060202; ES 2245495 T3 20060101; JP 2000161031 A 20000613; US 6374784 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061104

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912577 P 20060202

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245495 T3

2005-10-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912577 P 20051027

2005-10-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-09-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI