Global Patent Index - EP 1001157 A2

EP 1001157 A2 2000-05-17 - Fuel pump with in-tank auxiliary reservoir

Title (en)

Fuel pump with in-tank auxiliary reservoir

Title (de)

Kraftstoffförderpumpe mit Staubehälter

Title (fr)

Pompe à carburant avec réservoir auxiliaire disposé dans le réservoir principal

Publication

EP 1001157 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120039 A

Priority

DE 19852235 A

Abstract (en)

The pump unit has a buffer container (5) for storing liquid fuel with a fuel suction opening (10) in its lower region and a fuel pump (2) that sucks fuel (20) out of the container and delivers it to a pump outlet (9). The fuel pump has a degassing valve (16) via which any gas collecting in the pump as fuel is delivered can be removed from the pump bypassing the fuel outlet and that seals the interior of the pump against the ingress of gas.

Abstract (de)

Kraftstofffördereinheiten, wie sie in Kraftstofftanks insbesondere von Kraftfahrzeugen zur Förderung des Kraftstoffes eingesetzt werden, können unter ungünstigen Umständen trockenlaufen, obwohl sich noch mehrere Literkraftstoff (20) in dem Tank befinden. Um dies zu Verhindern, ist erfindungsgemäß ein Zweiwegeventil (16) als Entgasungsventil in der Kraftstoffpumpe (2) vorgesehen. Alternativ zu dem Zweiwegeventil kann im Deckel (7) des Staubehälters (5) ein Ventil eingesetzt sein, das bei einem Stillstand der Pumpe (2) und einem niedrigeren Kraftstoffpegel den Kraftstoff (20) im Reservoirraum (6) des Staubehälters (5) soweit absinken läßt, daß der Kraftstoffpegel im Reservoirraum unterhalb der Einlaß- und Auslaßöffnungen (13) liegt. Durch diese Maßnahmen wird ein Absinken des Kraftstoffpegels im Reservoirraum (6) unterhalb eine bestimmte Höhe verhindert. Insbesondere das Ventil in dem Deckel (7) ist ohne größere konstruktive Änderungen in bestehenden Systemen einsetzbar. Die Erfindung findet Anwendung bei Kraftstofffördereinheiten, die in Kraftstofftanks von Kraftfahrzeugen gesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/106 (2013.01); F02M 37/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0120343 B1 19880427

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001157 A2 20000517; EP 1001157 A3 20000816; DE 19852235 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050916

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI