Global patent index - EP 1001212 A2

EP 1001212 A2 2000-05-17 - Position locking mechanism for an automated luminaire

Title (en)

Position locking mechanism for an automated luminaire

Title (de)

Lagesperrvorrichtung für automatisch verstellbare Leuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage en position pour luminaire réglé automatiquement

Publication

EP 1001212 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308982 A

Priority

  • US 10801498 P
  • US 16444599 P

Abstract (en)

An automated lighting fixtures which automatically locks specific moving part(s) into fixed position(s) when power is not supplied to facilitate packaging, shipping, load-in and load-out of the fixtures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/007 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001212 A2 20000517; EP 1001212 A3 20010926

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NASH, DEREK C/O HIGH END SYSTEMS, INC.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LANE, JOHN W. II C/O HIGH END SYSTEMS, INC.

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI