Global Patent Index - EP 1001213 A1

EP 1001213 A1 2000-05-17 - Corrosion and/or abrasion protection shells for a tube panel and method of fixing

Title (en)

Corrosion and/or abrasion protection shells for a tube panel and method of fixing

Title (de)

Schutzschalen gegen Korrosion und/oder Abrieb von einer Röhrenplatte und Verfahren zur Befestigung

Title (fr)

Coquilles de protection contre la corrosion et/ou l'abrasion d'un panneau de tubes et procédé de fixation

Publication

EP 1001213 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402446 A

Priority

FR 9814155 A

Abstract (en)

The tube panel protector consists of a pair of shells (4) fitted to opposite sides of the panel (1) and held together by keys (5) inserted through holes (6) between adjacent tubes (2). Each key has at least one free end (5a) to engage with a cavity (7) in one of the shells, holding it in place by gravity and/or adhesion.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de protection contre la corrosion et/ou l'abrasion d'un panneau de tubes notamment d'un surchauffeur d'une chaudière, ainsi que le procédé de fixation de coquilles de protection à un tel panneau. Le dispositif est caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend des clavettes (5) logées chacune amoviblement entre deux tubes adjacents (2) du panneau (1), en appui sur le bord inférieur d'une ouverture (6) réalisée à travers une ailette (3) de raccordement de deux tubes adjacents (2) et ayant au moins une partie d'extrémité libre (5a) apte à s'engager dans un logement (7) de la coquille de protection (4) de façon à permettre l'accrochage de la coquille et la retenue de celle-ci par gravité. L'invention trouve application pour des panneaux de surchauffeur de chaudière d'incinération de déchets. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 37/10; F22G 3/00; F23M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/10 (2006.01); F23M 5/04 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/08 (2013.01); F22B 37/107 (2013.01); F22B 37/108 (2013.01); F23M 5/04 (2013.01); F28F 19/002 (2013.01); F23M 2900/05001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001213 A1 20000517; EP 1001213 B1 20030507; DE 69907604 D1 20030612; DE 69907604 T2 20040325; ES 2198119 T3 20040116; FR 2785670 A1 20000512; FR 2785670 B1 20010105; PT 1001213 E 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151005

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69907604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198119

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1001213E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT PT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT PT

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI