Global Patent Index - EP 1001214 A1

EP 1001214 A1 2000-05-17 - Burner

Title (en)

Burner

Title (de)

Brenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur

Publication

EP 1001214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811115 A

Priority

EP 98811115 A

Abstract (en)

The flow instability prevention process involves transporting fuel by means of a combustion air flow (10) into a combustion chamber (21) The air flow is mixed with the fuel during transporting and is guided by the shell elements (13, 16). The build-up of first coherent flow instabilities in the boundary layer between the combustion air and the shell elements is disturbed, so a coupling of an acoustic field to such instabilities in the combustion chamber is prevented.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren und einer Vorrichtung zum Betrieb eines Brenners (19), bei welchem ein Verbrennungsluftstrom (10) Brennstoff in eine Brennkammer (21) transportiert, wo der Brennstoff verbrannt wird, und beim Transport der Verbrennungsluftstrom (10) mit dem Brennstoff vermischt und von Verschalungselementen (13,16) geführt wird, wird die aufschaukelnde Wechselwirkung von kohärenten Strömungsinstabilitäten und akkustischem Feld vermindert, indem die Ausbildung von ersten periodischen, kohärenten Strömungsinstabilitäten in einer Grenzschicht zwischen der Verbrennungsluft (10) und den Verschalungselementen (13,16) gestört wird, und dass eine Ankopplung eines akkustischen Feldes in der Brennkammer (21) an solche ersten Strömungsinstabilitäten vermindert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 11/40; F23D 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/402 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0321809 B1 19910515

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001214 A1 20000517; EP 1001214 B1 20040915; DE 59811961 D1 20041021; US 2001019815 A1 20010906

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811961 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BURNER

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030623

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI