Global Patent Index - EP 1001218 A2

EP 1001218 A2 2000-05-17 - Water-cooled combustion grate, as well as process for incinerating wastes on it

Title (en)

Water-cooled combustion grate, as well as process for incinerating wastes on it

Title (de)

Wassergekühlter Verbrennungsrost, sowie Verfahren zum Verbrennen von Kehricht auf demselben

Title (fr)

Grille de combustion refroidie par eau, ainsi que procédé de combustion de déchets sur celle-ci

Publication

EP 1001218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810954 A

Priority

CH 224798 A

Abstract (en)

The burner grill has stacked, water-cooled grill plates extending over part or all of the width of the grill path and each forming a grill stage. At least every second grill stage is movable and has primary air delivery openings (25) via which dosed primary air can be fed to the fire individually or zonally. The burner grill consists of a combination of a forward feed grill (30) and a backward feed grill (31). An Independent claim is also included for a method of burning rubbish.

Abstract (de)

Der wassergekühlte Verbrennungsrost besteht aus einer Kombination eines Vorschub- (30) und eines Rückschubrostes (31), die beide wassergekühlte Rostplatten aufweisen, von denen mindestens jede zweite (6) beweglich ausgeführt ist. Der Rost ist weiter von Primärluftzufuhröffnungen (25) durchsetzt, durch welche einzeln oder zonenweise Pirmärluft dosiert dem Feuer zuführbar ist. Das mit diesem Verbrennungsrost betreibbare Verfahren zum Verbrennen von Kehricht erfolgt so, dass zunächst auf dem Vorschubrost (30) das ankommende Brenngut mittels individueller Steuerung der Hublänge und Hubfrequenz der einzelnen Rostplatten (6) des dortigen Vorschubrostes (30) zu einem gleichmässigen Brennbett auseinandergezogen und dann als solches unter Ausbrand der leicht brennbaren Stoffe weiter transportiert wird und schliesslich auf den nachgeschalteten Rückschubrost (31) gelangt, wo das gleichmässige Brennbett mittels individueller Steuerung der Hublänge und Hubfrequenz der einzelnen Rostplatten (6) so lange geschürt wird, bis ein möglichst vollständiger Ausbrand aller Stoffe erreicht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02; F23G 5/00; F23H 1/02; F23H 7/08; F23L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 1/02 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23L 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 1/02 (2013.01); F23G 5/002 (2013.01); F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23L 1/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0621449 A1 19941026 - DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001218 A2 20000517; EP 1001218 A3 20001206; EP 1001218 B1 20011212; AT 210800 T 20011215; DE 59900534 D1 20020124; DK 1001218 T3 20020408

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041020

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-10-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041020

2003-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031010

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021020

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900534 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210800 T 20011215

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI