Global Patent Index - EP 1001219 A1

EP 1001219 A1 2000-05-17 - Gas cock with thermocouple safety valve

Title (en)

Gas cock with thermocouple safety valve

Title (de)

Gashahn mit thermoelektrischem Sicherheitsventil

Title (fr)

Robinet à gaz avec une soupape de sécurité à thermocouple

Publication

EP 1001219 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120516 A

Priority

DE 19852128 A

Abstract (en)

The gas tap has a thermoelectric safety valve (27) influenced by an axially movable pin (3) passing through the tap axle (8) via one of the tap plugs (2). An axial movement of the pin is caused via an esp. cam-shaped pitch curve (4,7-13.27) by turning the tap axle, whereby the length of the tap axle in the axial direction remains unchanged.

Abstract (de)

Gashahn zur Steuerung einer Gasbrennstelle, insbesondere für Haushaltskoch- und Heizgeräte, mit einem durch die Hahnachse (8) über einen das Hahnküken (2) durchdringenden in axialer Richtung verschiebbaren Stößel (3) beeinflußbares thermoelektrisches Sicherheitsventil (27), wobei durch Drehbewegung der Hahnachse (8) eine axiale Vorschubbewegung des Stößels über eine insbesondere nockenartige Steigungskurve (4,7 bis 13,17) erzeugbar ist, wobei die Lage der Hahnachse (8) in axialer Richtung unverändert bleibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/10; F23K 5/00; F23Q 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/10 (2006.01); F23Q 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/007 (2013.01); F23N 5/107 (2013.01); F23Q 9/14 (2013.01); F23N 2041/08 (2013.01); Y10T 137/1516 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87981 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2943996 A1 19810514 - ELEKTRO GAS ARMATUREN [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001219 A1 20000517; DE 19852128 A1 20000518; US 6234189 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI