Global Patent Index - EP 1001223 A2

EP 1001223 A2 2000-05-17 - Gas turbine with rotary fuel injection

Title (en)

Gas turbine with rotary fuel injection

Title (de)

Kleingasturbine mit einer Radial- oder Slinger-Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Turbine à gaz avec injection du carburant rotatif

Publication

EP 1001223 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122467 A

Priority

DE 19852768 A

Abstract (en)

The gas turbine has a radial or slinger combustion chamber (1) preceded by a radial or diagonal compressor (2) and a turbine part (5) connected to it via an axial rotor shaft (4) with at least one roller bearing (36). Fuel passes through a feed tube (12) in the compressor rotor wheel (2a) into a crossing part (4b) of the rotor shaft in a region of the combustion chamber near the compressor, and via this into combustion chamber radial delivery bores (17). A centrifugal siphon (14) in or upstream of the crossing part before the delivery bores carries fuel. A capillary tube (38) that branches off the delivery siphon on the combustion chamber side, and hence upstream of the delivery bores, carries a sub-flow of fuel to the roller bearing (36) on the turbine part side.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kleingasturbine mit einer Radial- oder Slinger-Brennkammer sowie mit einem der Radial- oder Slinger-Brennkammer vorgelagerten Radialverdichter oder Diagonalverdichter und einem mit diesem über eine in Axialrichtung verlaufende, über zumindest ein Wälzlager gelagerte Rotorwelle verbundenen Turbinenteil, wobei der Brennstoff durch ein im Laufrad des Radialverdichters / Diagonalverdichters vorgesehenes Förderrohr in ein im verdichternahen Bereich der Brennkammer liegendes Kreuzungsteil der Rotorwelle gelangt und über in diesem im wesentlichen in Radialrichtung verlaufende Zulieferbohrungen der Brennkammer zugeführt wird, und wobei im oder stromauf des Kreuzungsteil(es) ein den Zulieferbohrungen vorgelagerter vom Brennstoff durchströmter Fliehkraftsiphon vorgesehen ist. Erfindungsgemäß zweigt vom Fliehkraftsiphon brennkammerseitig und dabei stromauf der Zulieferbohrungen ein Kapillarrohr ab, über welches eine Brennstoff-Teilmenge dem turbinenteilseitigen Wälzlager zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/38; F01D 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/18 (2006.01); F23R 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/18 (2013.01); F23R 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001223 A2 20000517; EP 1001223 A3 20020717; EP 1001223 B1 20030723; DE 19852768 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101111

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906345

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906345

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101111

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906345 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOECK, ALEXANDER

2003-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOECK, ALEXANDER

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23R 3/38 A, 7F 01D 25/18 B, 7F 01M 9/04 B

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI