Global Patent Index - EP 1001236 A2

EP 1001236 A2 2000-05-17 - Process for producing ultra pure nitrogen

Title (en)

Process for producing ultra pure nitrogen

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Gewinnung von ultrareinem Stickstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'azote à ultra haute pureté

Publication

EP 1001236 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122146 A

Priority

  • DE 19852019 A
  • DE 19924375 A

Abstract (en)

The oxygen-free pressurized nitrogen fraction is released into the low pressure column which is heated in its sump. In the low pressure column, raising vapors form and by means of a cycle ultrapure nitrogen from carbon monoxide is released at the top of the low pressure column, carbon monoxide-free head-gas is removed at the top of the low pressure column and partially liquefied at raised pressure. The liquefied portion is released in He-Ne-He-column which is heated in its sump, and the ultrapure nitrogen is removed as liquid. The oxygen-free pressurized nitrogen fraction is drawn either from an upper portion of the pressure column liquid or ready in a liquid tank with stored oxygen-free nitrogen. Process for producing ultrapure nitrogen is by means of low temperature analysis of air in a rectifying system having a rectifying column where compressed; passing purified air into a pressure column from which oxygen-free nitrogen pressure fraction is produced; passing the fraction into a low pressure column and producing as head gas carbon monoxide free low pressure nitrogen in the low pressure column.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Gewinnung von ultrareinem Stickstoff durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft in einem Rektifiziersystem mit wenigstens einer Rektifiziersäule, wobei verdichtete und gereinigte Einsatzluft in eine Drucksäule geführt, aus der Drucksäule eine sauerstofffreie Druckstickstofffraktion gewonnen, in eine Niederdrucksäule geführt und in der Niederdrucksäule kohlenmonoxidfreier Niederdruckstickstoff als Kopfgas gewonnen wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird die sauerstofffreie Druckstickstofffraktion (1) entweder aus einem oberen Bereich der Drucksäule flüssig entnommen oder aus einem Flüssigkeitstank (22) mit gespeichertem sauerstofffreiem Stickstoff bereitgestellt und die sauerstofffreie Druckstickstofffraktion (1) in die in ihrem Sumpf beheizte Niederdrucksäule (2) entspannt. Hierbei wird in der Niederdrucksäule (2) aufsteigender Dampf gebildet und mit Hilfe eines am Kopf der Niederdrucksäule (2) aufgegebenen Rücklaufes mit ultrareinem Stickstoff von Kohlenmonoxid befreit, am Kopf der Niederdrucksäule (2) als kohlenmonoxidfreies Kopfgas (5) abgezogen und nach einer Druckerhöhung (5) teilweise verflüssigt. Der verflüssigte Teil (17, 18) wird in eine in ihrem Sumpf beheizte He-Ne-H2-Säule (4) entspannt, aus der der ultrareine Stickstoff (19) flüssig entnommen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F25J 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04218 (2013.01); F25J 3/04084 (2013.01); F25J 3/04212 (2013.01); F25J 3/04284 (2013.01); F25J 3/04351 (2013.01); F25J 3/04454 (2013.01); F25J 3/04963 (2013.01); F25J 3/08 (2013.01); F25J 2200/04 (2013.01); F25J 2200/10 (2013.01); F25J 2200/50 (2013.01); F25J 2200/72 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2215/44 (2013.01); F25J 2220/42 (2013.01); F25J 2220/44 (2013.01); F25J 2235/42 (2013.01); F25J 2245/42 (2013.01); F25J 2250/20 (2013.01); F25J 2250/42 (2013.01); F25J 2270/42 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01); Y10S 62/92 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001236 A2 20000517; EP 1001236 A3 20001108; EP 1001236 B1 20040929; AT 278166 T 20041015; CA 2289173 A1 20000511; CN 1134640 C 20040114; CN 1255619 A 20000607; DE 19929798 A1 20000525; ES 2229608 T3 20050416; JP 2000180051 A 20000630; KR 20000035406 A 20000626; SG 74755 A1 20000822; TW 432191 B 20010501; US 6276172 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-08-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061106

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2006-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061101

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229608 T3

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050116

2004-12-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910646 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020906

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25J 3/04 A, 7F 25J 3/08 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI