Global Patent Index - EP 1001237 A1

EP 1001237 A1 2000-05-17 - Heating process of a continuous furnace, in particular for steel products and continuous furnace

Title (en)

Heating process of a continuous furnace, in particular for steel products and continuous furnace

Title (de)

Beheizungsverfahren eines kontinuierlich arbeitenden Ofens für Stahl Produkte und kontinuierlich arbeitender Ofen

Title (fr)

Procédé de chauffage d'un four à chargement continu notamment pour produits sidérurgiques, et four de chauffage à chargement continu

Publication

EP 1001237 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402559 A

Priority

FR 9814127 A

Abstract (en)

Heating process for steel products, in a continuous charging type furnace where products (1) flow from a charging end (2) to an end (3) for drawing the charge; the furnace comprises a heating zone (4) with air/fuel burners (41) possibly doped with oxygen, with air combustion fumes released near the end (3); a recovery zone of the fumes (5) is located in that area; the process is characterized by the introduction of gaseous combustive material with the fumes, and the introduction of possibly doped oxygen gas upstream of the most upstream air/fuel burner, the combustive material is burnt rising the temperature in the recovery zone. An Independent claim is also included for a heating furnace.

Abstract (fr)

Les produits (1) défilent d'une extrémité d'enfournement (2) à une extrémité de défournement (3) ; le four présente, du côté de l'extrémité de défournement, une zone de chauffage (4) équipée de brûleurs air/combustible (41) éventuellement dopés à l'oxygène, et, du côté de l'extrémité d'enfournement, une zone de récupération ou épuisement (5) des fumées, dans laquelle les fumées sont évacuées. Au moins un corps combustible à l'état gazeux est incorporé aux fumées, et de l'oxygène est introduit en amont du brûleur air/combustible (41) éventuellement dopé qui est le plus en amont lorsque l'on se réfère au sens de défilement des produits (1), pour brûler le corps combustible gazeux et ainsi élever la température dans la zone de récupération (5). Utilisation possible pour chauffer des produits sidérurgiques préalablement au laminage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 9/30; F27B 9/36; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/52 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/30 (2006.01); F27B 9/36 (2006.01); F27B 9/40 (2006.01); F27D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/3011 (2013.01); C21D 9/0006 (2013.01); C21D 9/0056 (2013.01); F27B 9/36 (2013.01); F27B 9/40 (2013.01); C21D 1/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001237 A1 20000517; AR 021119 A1 20020612; BR 9905320 A 20000905; CA 2286967 A1 20000510; FR 2785668 A1 20000512; FR 2785668 B1 20010223; JP 2000144241 A 20000526; US 6183246 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121213

2007-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT LU

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI