Global Patent Index - EP 1001239 A1

EP 1001239 A1 2000-05-17 - Heat exchanger with tube bundle in cylindrical housing

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with tube bundle in cylindrical housing

Title (de)

Rohrbündelwärmetauscher mit zylindrischem Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à faisceau de tubes contenu dans un boîtier cylindrique

Publication

EP 1001239 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99122386 A

Priority

FR 9814347 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger, made e.g. from stainless steel, has a generally cylindrical housing with an inlet and outlet, end partitions with a bank of parallel tubes passing through them, and domed end covers (8) forming manifolds. each end cover is made from drawn sheet metal, and at least one of them has a cylindrical portion (10) for connecting to the inside of a flange for a second fluid inlet or outlet pipe. The cylindrical and adjacent radial (19) portions of the dome are connected to the flange by brazing.

Abstract (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur pour la récupération de la chaleur des gaz d'échappement d'un véhicule automobile, dans lequel les gaz d'échappement circulent entre deux boîtes collectrices (13, 14) délimitées par des coupelles respectives (7, 8) et par les parois d'extrémité (2, 3) d'un boîtier cylindrique (1-3), en passant dans des tubes (6) allongés en direction axiale dans le boîtier. Selon l'invention, les coupelles (7, 8) sont réalisées par emboutissage à partir d'une tôle mince, ce qui conduit à une réduction de poids et de coût et permet aux coupelles de rester emboîtées par élasticité sur les extrémités du boîtier, jusqu'à l'opération de brasage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 7/16; F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/16 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0219 (2013.01); F28D 7/16 (2013.01); F28F 9/02 (2013.01); F28D 21/0003 (2013.01); F28F 2009/029 (2013.01); Y10S 165/416 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001239 A1 20000517; EP 1001239 B1 20030416; DE 69906910 D1 20030522; ES 2200454 T3 20040301; FR 2785980 A1 20000519; FR 2785980 B1 20011130; US 6390186 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091110

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091110

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200454 T3

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906910 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI