Global Patent Index - EP 1001243 A1

EP 1001243 A1 2000-05-17 - Arrangement for installing equipment on the roof of a vehicle

Title (en)

Arrangement for installing equipment on the roof of a vehicle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Anordnung von Geräten auf dem Dach eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Installation pour monter des dispositifs sur le toit d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1001243 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99610070 A

Priority

NO 985338 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an arrangement for mounting grenade launchers on the rooftop of a military vehicle, notably a weasel. The invention benefits from the roof hatch already included in the vehicle. To mount the launcher, the roof hatch is removed and a specially constructed gutter is installed in the roof aperture. The gutter includes brackets on which the launching gear may be mounted. The gutter also includes brackets whereupon the roof hatch can be re-installed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/22; F41A 23/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/223 (2013.01); F41A 23/34 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001243 A1 20000517; NO 308784 B1 20001030; NO 985338 A 20000518; NO 985338 D0 19981116

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI