Global Patent Index - EP 1001244 A1

EP 1001244 A1 2000-05-17 - Artillery projectile

Title (en)

Artillery projectile

Title (de)

Artilleriegeschoss

Title (fr)

Obus d'artillerie

Publication

EP 1001244 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122446 A

Priority

DE 19852626 A

Abstract (en)

The shell has a head detonator unit (30), which senses the distance from the target or the impact, and sends the signals to a base detonator unit (19) which detonates the explosive. A penetrator (7) forms part of the shell's outer casing. The base detonator has a safety device (31), a time lag unit (32) and a detonator (21) to ignite the explosive charge (13).

Abstract (de)

Ein Artilleriegeschoß (1) ist als Multifunktionssprenggeschoß ausgebildet. Neben der Bekämpfung von Zielen über Luftsprengpunkt und im Aufschlag werden Ziele im Schutzzustand mit einer Zündung mit Zeitverzögerung nach erfolgtem Penetrationsvorgang bekämpft. Ein Kopfzünder (30) sensiert nach vorgegebener Funktionsweise den Abstand oder den Aufschlag und leitet die Signale an einen Bodenzünder (19), der die Detonation des Sprengstoffs (13) einleitet. Ein Penetrator (7) ist Bestandteil der Geschoßhülle (6). Damit ist gewährleistet, daß die Geschoßhülle (6) die Durchdringungsfähigkeit von Beton aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/06 (2006.01); F42B 12/20 (2006.01); F42C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/204 (2013.01); F42B 12/06 (2013.01); F42C 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001244 A1 20000517; EP 1001244 B1 20030723; DE 19852626 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051111

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-11-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-01-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404036

2003-11-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906346 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB GR IT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI