Global Patent Index - EP 1001308 A1

EP 1001308 A1 2000-05-17 - Lens-fitted photo film unit, and method of making photo-print

Title (en)

Lens-fitted photo film unit, and method of making photo-print

Title (de)

Mit einer Linse versehene photographische Filmeinheit und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Abdrucks

Title (fr)

Unité de film muni d'une lentille et méthode de fabrication d'un image

Publication

EP 1001308 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308503 A

Priority

  • JP 30564698 A
  • JP 8041999 A

Abstract (en)

A lens-fitted photo film unit can take indoor- and night-photographs at adequate tone- and color-reproductions, by satisfying the condition: <MATH> wherein T, A and S represents the shutter speed, the aperture size, and the ISO film speed. The film speed is determined to be not less than ISO640, and more preferably not less than ISO1000. The guide number (ISO100.m) of a flash device of the film unit is set to be in a range from 0.1 to 8, more preferably from 1 to 6, and most preferably from 3 to 5, and satisfies the condition: 8.0 log2 (G<2>) + log2 (1/T) 12.0, in combination with the shutter speed T. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03B 19/04 (2013.01); G03B 2219/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001308 A1 20000517; EP 1001308 B1 20060426; DE 69931008 D1 20060601; DE 69931008 T2 20061116; US 6222995 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028279

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931008 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040427

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI