Global Patent Index - EP 1001310 A1

EP 1001310 A1 2000-05-17 - Method of processing silver halide color photographic material

Title (en)

Method of processing silver halide color photographic material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines farbphotographischen Silberhalogenidmaterials

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement d'un produit photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 1001310 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00101973 A

Priority

  • EP 96108590 A
  • JP 15556895 A
  • JP 17390595 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a method for processing a silver halide color photographic material, which has excellent adaptability for rapid processing and bleaching ability preferred in view of environmental conservation, comprising color developing a photographic material comprising a support having thereon at least one red-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer, at least one green-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer, at least one blue-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer and at least one light-insensitive layer, at least one of the light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layers having a silver chloride content of 50 mol% or more, and then processing the photographic material with a processing solution having bleaching ability which contains at least one ferric complex salt of the compound represented by formula (I) : <CHEM> wherein R1, L1, L2, and M1 and M2 are as defined in the specification

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/42; G03C 7/407; G03C 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/42 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01); G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/42 (2006.01); G03C 7/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/421 (2013.01); G03C 7/3029 (2013.01); G03C 7/407 (2013.01); G03C 7/42 (2013.01); G03C 1/42 (2013.01); G03C 7/3022 (2013.01); G03C 7/39248 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2001/097
  2. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 2001/03517 + G03C 2001/097 + G03C 1/0051

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747765 A1 19961211; EP 0747765 B1 20010822; DE 69614616 D1 20010927; DE 69614616 T2 20011206; DE 69629602 D1 20030925; DE 69629602 T2 20040624; EP 1001310 A1 20000517; EP 1001310 B1 20030820; JP H0950103 A 19970218

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69629602

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69629602

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-09-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040530

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69629602 P 20030925

2003-08-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0747765 P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL SE

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-05-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 747765

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE