Global patent index - EP 1001355 A3

EP 1001355 A3 2000-08-23 - Apparatus and process for facilitating customer-driven sales of products having multiple configurations

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for facilitating customer-driven sales of products having multiple configurations

Title (de)

Apparat und Verfahren zum Erleichtern des durch Kunden gesteuerten Verkaufs von Produkten mit mehreren Konfigurationen

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour faciliter des ventes dirigées par les clients de produits ayant des configurations multiples

Publication

EP 1001355 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99203749 A

Priority

  • US 18886398 A
  • US 37457799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001355A2] The present invention provides an apparatus and process for facilitating customer-driven sales of products having multiple configurations, preferably automobiles and trucks. The apparatus is a computer network comprising a server with a product database thereon, an intermediary subsystem, and a seller subsystem. The server, intermediary subsystem, and seller subsystem function together and communicate with each other to allow an intermediary, on behalf of a customer, to configure a feasible product, transmit a request for quote (RFQ) to a target set of sellers in the customer's geographic area, receive quotes from the target sellers in response to the RFQ, and transmit the customer's acceptance of one of the quotes to the appropriate seller. The apparatus may also include a customer subsystem by which the customer may configure their own feasible product and transmit their feasible product information to the intermediary. The intermediary subsystem can optionally include a product database thereon which the intermediary can use to configure a feasible product without communicating with the server. The process allows an intermediary to configure a feasible product, transmit a request for quote (RFQ) to a target set of sellers in the customer's geographic area, receive quotes from the target sellers in response to the RFQ, and transmit the customer's acceptance of one of the quotes to the appropriate seller. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2012.01); G06Q 50/18 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06Q 50/188 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99939 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99945 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99948 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001355 A2 20000517; EP 1001355 A3 20000823; CA 2289249 A1 20000509; US 2008228657 A1 20080918; US 7236983 B1 20070626

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI