Global Patent Index - EP 1001362 A1

EP 1001362 A1 2000-05-17 - A printer system

Title (en)

A printer system

Title (de)

Drucksystem

Title (fr)

Système d'impression

Publication

EP 1001362 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308201 A

Priority

GB 9825020 A

Abstract (en)

A portable printer is provided which provides active cooperation between a computer and the portable printer unit. A number of different features are introduced into the printing unit which allow greater responsiveness from the computer responsive to actions taken at the printer unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 15/00; G06K 15/10; B41J 3/36; B41J 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/28 (2006.01); B41J 3/36 (2006.01); G06K 15/00 (2006.01); G06K 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001362 A1 20000517; EP 1001362 B1 20030226; DE 1001362 T1 20010823; DE 69905539 D1 20030403; DE 69905539 T2 20040219; DE 69917495 D1 20040624; DE 69917495 T2 20040916; EP 1231561 A1 20020814; EP 1231561 B1 20040519; GB 9825020 D0 19990106

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69905539

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101018

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905539 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-08-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI