Global Patent Index - EP 1001385 A2

EP 1001385 A2 2000-05-17 - On the fly satellite communication

Title (en)

On the fly satellite communication

Title (de)

Sofortige Kommunikation über Satelliten

Title (fr)

Communication instantanée par satellite

Publication

EP 1001385 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120859 A

Priority

US 19032098 A

Abstract (en)

A satellite communication system communicates a vehicle to a number of entities. As examples, the communication system will communicate diagnostic information from the vehicle to manufacturers, including the vehicle manufacturer, component manufacturers, and the vehicle owner. The diagnostic information could include, as an example only, information from an accelerometer with regard to the vehicle having traveled over large bumps. If this information is communicated to an axle manufacturer, the axle manufacturer can use the information to question warranty returns on the particular vehicle. Further, the entities can communicate with the vehicle to upload computer information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01); G07C 5/08 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/127 (2013.01); G07C 5/008 (2013.01); G07C 5/0808 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001385 A2 20000517; EP 1001385 A3 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07C 5/00 A, 7G 07C 5/08 B, 7G 08G 1/127 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI