Global patent index - EP 1001397 A2

EP 1001397 A2 2000-05-17 - Transducer and method for operating a transducer

Title (en)

Transducer and method for operating a transducer

Title (de)

Messumformer sowie Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Messumformers

Title (fr)

Transducteur de mesure et procédé d'opération associé

Publication

EP 1001397 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121437 A

Priority

DE 19850579 A

Abstract (en)

The operating method has the measuring transducer switched from a measuring mode to an emergency mode upon detection of a fault condition, with storage of the detected fault condition and subsequent switching of the measuring transducer from the emergency mode to the measuring mode when the fault is resolved. An Independent claim for a measuring transducer is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Meßumformers sowie einen Meßumformer. Beim erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren wird der Meßumformer nach dem Auftreten einer Störung von einem Betriebszustand in einen Störzustand überführt. Im Störzustand wird die Störung gespeichert. Verschwindet die Störung am Meßumformer, so wird derselbe wieder in den Betriebszustand überführt. Mit Hilfe des erfindungsgemäßen Verfahrens ist demnach eine hohe Verfügbarkeit des Meßumformers sichergestellt. Durch die Speicherung der Störungen wird für eine hohe Störungs-Kenntnisnahme und damit Störungs-Behebung gesorgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850579 A1 20000511; DE 19850579 C2 20010913; EP 1001397 A2 20000517; EP 1001397 A3 20070404

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2008-04-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20080116

2008-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2007-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI