Global Patent Index - EP 1001400 A2

EP 1001400 A2 2000-05-17 - Device to show product or price informations

Title (en)

Device to show product or price informations

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour présenter des informations de prix ou de produits

Publication

EP 1001400 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117959 A

Priority

DE 19852171 A

Abstract (en)

For the display of product and/or price information, a support housing has at least one view container in which are individual view compartments for the accommodation of product and/or price information. The support housing (2) comprises a rear wall (9) with upper and lower holding cheeks (7,8). In the assembled state, the cheeks engage around upper and lower edge areas of the view container. At least one sprung holding component (10) is provided between the upper holding cheek and the rear wall and between the lower holding cheek and the rear wall, by means of which the upper and lower cheeks are unreleasably connected with the rear wall.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation (6), bestehend aus einem Trägergehäuse (2) und zumindest einem Sichtbehälter (3), wobei der Sichtbehälter (3) einzelne Sichtfächer (5) für die Aufnahme von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation (6) aufweist. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Vorrichtung vorzuschlagen, die es erlaubt, die Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation (6) einfach und sicher auszuwechseln. Die Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß das Trägergehäuse (2) aus einer Rückwand (9), einer oberen Haltewange (7) und einer unteren Haltewange (8) besteht, wobei - im montierten Zustand - die obere Haltewange (7) und die untere Haltewange (8) den oberen Randbereich (17a) und den unteren Randbereich (17b) des Sichtbehälters (3) umgreifen, und daß zumindest ein federndes Halteelement (10) zwischen der oberen Haltewange (7) und der Rückwand (9) bzw. zwischen der unteren Haltewange (8) und der Rückwand (9) vorgesehen ist, über die die obere Haltewange (7) bzw. die untere Haltewange (8) unlösbar mit der Rückwand (9) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001400 A2 20000517; EP 1001400 A3 20010103; DE 19852171 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040421

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI