Global Patent Index - EP 1001400 A3

EP 1001400 A3 2001-01-03 - Device to show product or price informations

Title (en)

Device to show product or price informations

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour présenter des informations de prix ou de produits

Publication

EP 1001400 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117959 A

Priority

DE 19852171 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001400A2] For the display of product and/or price information, a support housing has at least one view container in which are individual view compartments for the accommodation of product and/or price information. The support housing (2) comprises a rear wall (9) with upper and lower holding cheeks (7,8). In the assembled state, the cheeks engage around upper and lower edge areas of the view container. At least one sprung holding component (10) is provided between the upper holding cheek and the rear wall and between the lower holding cheek and the rear wall, by means of which the upper and lower cheeks are unreleasably connected with the rear wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001400 A2 20000517; EP 1001400 A3 20010103; DE 19852171 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040421

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI