Global Patent Index - EP 1001403 A2

EP 1001403 A2 2000-05-17 - Mounting device with advertising support for vehicles

Title (en)

Mounting device with advertising support for vehicles

Title (de)

Anbauvorrichtung mit einem Werbeträger für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage de support publicitaire pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1001403 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122711 A

Priority

  • DE 19852555 A
  • DE 29820390 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement is mounted near the rear upper edge of the vehicle body and has a carrier (6) in which an advertising medium (7) can be rolled and unrolled. The carrier is pivotable between loading and operating positions. In the loading position no part of the arrangement protrudes near the loading doors. The advertising medium has a clamping arrangement (8) on its end opposite the carrier for attachment to the vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Anbauvorrichtung mit einem Werbeträger für Kraftfahrzeuge, insbesondere Lastkraftwagen, wobei die Anbauvorrichtung im Bereich einer hinteren Oberkante eines Fahrzeugaufbaus angeordnet ist und eine Trageinrichtung (6) aufweist, in der ein Werbeträger ein- und ausrollbar gelagert ist, wobei die Trageinrichtung (6) über die Oberkante des Kastenaufbaus bzw. des LKW-Aufbaus in Fahrtrichtung nach vorne oben in eine Ladestellung und gegen die Fahrtrichtung in eine Betriebsstellung nach unten hinten schwenkbar ist, wobei in der Ladestellung kein Teil der Vorrichtung in den Bereich der Ladetüren ragt und wobei der Werbeträger mit einer an seinem der Trageinrichtung (6) gegenüberliegenden Ende angeordneten Spanneinrichtung (8) im Bereich einer hinteren unteren Kante des Lastkraftwagens beabstandet zur Heckfront des Lastkraftwagens befestigbar anordbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01); G09F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0025 (2013.01); G09F 21/04 (2013.01); G09F 21/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001403 A2 20000517; EP 1001403 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 21/04 A, 7G 09F 15/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI