Global Patent Index - EP 1001403 A3

EP 1001403 A3 2001-04-04 - Mounting device with advertising support for vehicles

Title (en)

Mounting device with advertising support for vehicles

Title (de)

Anbauvorrichtung mit einem Werbeträger für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage de support publicitaire pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1001403 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122711 A

Priority

  • DE 19852555 A
  • DE 29820390 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1001403A2] The arrangement is mounted near the rear upper edge of the vehicle body and has a carrier (6) in which an advertising medium (7) can be rolled and unrolled. The carrier is pivotable between loading and operating positions. In the loading position no part of the arrangement protrudes near the loading doors. The advertising medium has a clamping arrangement (8) on its end opposite the carrier for attachment to the vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 21/04; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01); G09F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0025 (2013.01); G09F 21/04 (2013.01); G09F 21/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001403 A2 20000517; EP 1001403 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 21/04 A, 7G 09F 15/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI