Global Patent Index - EP 1001433 A2

EP 1001433 A2 2000-05-17 - Process and apparatus for reducing the radioactive charge of radioactively contaminated objects

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for reducing the radioactive charge of radioactively contaminated objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verringerung der radioaktiven Belastung von radioaktiv strahlenden Körpern

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour réduire la charge radioactive des objets contaminés radioactivement

Publication

EP 1001433 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121926 A

Priority

DE 19851837 A

Abstract (en)

Process for treating radioactive products (18), e.g. plants, earth etc, comprises preparing a bath of polarized water, wetting at least one of the irradiated products with the water, leaving the product in the bath for a predetermined time, and then removing the product from the bath and drying.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung vorgeschlagen, bei dem radioaktiv belastete Körper behandelt werden. Die Behandlung erfolgt, indem die Körper, Pflanzen und Erde einem Bad mit rechtspolarisiertem Wasser während einer vorgegebenen Zeitdauer ausgesetzt werden und nach Ablauf dieser Zeitdauer aus dem Bad entfernt und ggf. getrocknet werden. Mit dem Verfahren läßt sich die radioaktive Belastung der Körper 18 drastisch reduzieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851837 A1 20000511; EP 1001433 A2 20000517; EP 1001433 A3 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070307

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: AL

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: LT

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: LV

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: MK

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: RO

2004-08-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040210

- Countries: SI

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI