Global Patent Index - EP 1001481 A2

EP 1001481 A2 2000-05-17 - Monolithically integrated interdigital coupler

Title (en)

Monolithically integrated interdigital coupler

Title (de)

Monolithisch integrierter Interdigitalkoppler

Title (fr)

Coupleur interdigital intégré monolithiquement

Publication

EP 1001481 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112727 A

Priority

DE 19851740 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19851740C1] The coupler has several parallel adjacent conductors (5-9), in which the end of each conductor is connected via a conducting air bridge (10-13) to a non-immediately adjacent conductor. A concentric capacitance (14-17) is connected between an air bridge and the conductor that it bridges. Connecting lines with stub conductors (101-402) are arranged at the gates of the coupler.

Abstract (de)

Ein technologisch leichter herstellbarer Interdigitalkoppler für den Millimeterwellenbereich besteht aus mehreren parallel nebeneinander verlaufenden Leitungen (5, 6, 7, 8, 9), wobei das Ende einer jeden Leitung über eine leitende Luftbrücke (10, 11, 12, 13) mit einer ihr nicht direkt benachbarten Leitung verbunden ist. Zur Realisierung einer engen Kopplung ist mindestens zwischen einer Luftbrücke (10, 11, 12, 13) und der von ihr jeweils überbrückten Leitung (6, 7, 8) eine konzentrierte Kapazität (14, 15, 16, 17) geschaltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/186 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851740 C1 20000105; EP 1001481 A2 20000517; EP 1001481 A3 20011004; US 6147570 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI